Senate | 05/11/2016 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 13 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |