House | 05/05/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |