Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date 6/17/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 537.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 15 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|