Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Effective date 8/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 76.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Reported favorably (5-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 290. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|