Senate | 05/19/2016 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 17 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 124. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |