House | 05/24/2016 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/18/2016 | Reported with amendments (8-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/18/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |