Senate | 05/18/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |