House | 04/21/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |