Senate | 06/06/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. | ||
House | 06/06/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/01/2016 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |