Senate | 06/06/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. | ||
House | 06/06/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 3. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2016 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 3 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |