Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|