Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 77 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|