Senate | 04/04/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/1/2016. | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |