Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|