Senate | 05/30/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. | ||
House | 05/24/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 75 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2016 | Reported favorably (5-0-1). | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/27/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |