Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|