LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR9
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR9
Action History
House
04/05/2016
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
House
04/04/2016
Received in the House from the Senate.
Senate
03/31/2016
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
Senate
03/30/2016
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
Senate
03/15/2016
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Senate
03/14/2016
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.