Senate | 05/23/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |