Senate | 05/16/2016 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016. | ||
House | 05/05/2016 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |