Senate | 05/05/2016 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Approved on 5/4/2016. | ||
House | 05/02/2016 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/2/2016. | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Received on 4/12/2016. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2016 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/5/2016. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | Received by the Senate Office on 4/4/2016. |