Senate | 05/23/2016 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Approved on 5/19/2016. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/17/2016. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Received on 5/17/2016. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2016 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/11/2016. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Request study by the committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/10/2016. |