Senate | 06/06/2016 | Returned to the Senate and approved. | ||
House | 06/06/2016 | Approved on 6/6/2016. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/3/2016. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Received on 6/3/2016. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2016 | Sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/31/2016. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/31/2016. |