Senate | 06/06/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |