LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR6
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR6
Action History
Senate
04/04/2016
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/1/2016.
Senate
03/28/2016
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
Senate
03/22/2016
Reported favorably.
Senate
03/15/2016
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Senate
03/14/2016
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.