Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR78 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2016 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 78
BY SENATOR BISHOP 
A RESOLUTION
To commend Reverend Charles Andrus, S.S.J. on the fortieth anniversary of his ordination.
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was born in Bolden, Louisiana on May 8, 1945; and
WHEREAS, he is a graduate of Southern University in Baton Rouge; and
WHEREAS, his first profession of vows took place on August 12, 1971, and his final
profession occurred on February 22, 1975; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus became a diaconate on April 5, 1975, and was
ordained on May 8, 1976; and
WHEREAS, he entered the Deacon Internship Program on June 14, 1975, and was
assigned to Our Lady of Perpetual Help Catholic Church in Washington, DC, and also
served as an associate pastor from October 1, 1978, to December 1978; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was an associate pastor at the Church of the Epiphany
in New Orleans from October 1, 1976, to September 1978, at St. Francis Xavier Catholic
Church in Houston, Texas, from December 10, 1978, to August 1982, and at St. Peter Claver
Catholic Church in New Orleans from September 1, 1982, to September 1983, where he also
served as the spiritual director of the House of Studies; and
WHEREAS, he returned to Houston in 1983 and served as the pastor of St. Francis
Xavier Catholic Church from October 1, 1983, to September 1987, was elected Consultor
General in June 1987, and served as Consultor General at The Josephite Generalate in
Baltimore, Maryland from October 3, 1987, to September 1991; and
WHEREAS, from October 1, 1991, to September 1994, Reverend Andrus served as
the pastor at St. Therese of Lisieux Catholic Church in Gulfport, Mississippi, and at St.
Brigid Catholic Church in Los Angeles, California, from October 1, 1994, to September 22,
2000; and
Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 78	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, he served as the director of the Office of African American Ministry
and the African American Catholic Evangelization Center in Los Angeles from October 1,
2000, to October 18, 2002; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus served as swingman at St. Theresa Catholic Church
in Crowley, Louisiana, from December 15, 2002, to September 2003, and was the administer
pro tempore at Our Lady Star of the Sea Catholic Church in Houston from March 20, 2003,
to September 4, 2003; and
WHEREAS, he served as pastor in an area ministry of Our Mother of Mercy Catholic
Church and Our Lady Star of the Sea Catholic Church in Houston from September 5, 2003,
to October 2005, and was the vicar for African American Catholics for the Archdiocese of
Galveston-Houston from January 1, 2005, to October 2005; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was the parochial vicar at St. Francis Xavier in Baton
Rouge and a member of the SSJ Hurricane Relief Team from January 1, 2006, to August
2006, and served as the parochial vicar at Corpus Christi-Epiphany Catholic Church in New
Orleans from August 11, 2006, to August 12, 2009; and
WHEREAS, he was elected as Area II Director from October 1, 2007, to June 13,
2011, and was reelected to that position and served in that capacity from June 14, 2011, to
June 2015; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was interim president of St. Augustine High School
in New Orleans from August 2009 to June 8, 2011, and has been serving as the pastor of
Blessed Sacrament-St. Joan of Arc Catholic Church in New Orleans since August 13, 2009;
and
WHEREAS, in addition to his pastoral duties, Reverend Andrus spends his weekends
in LaBeau, Louisiana, caring for his mother who is one hundred two years of age; and
WHEREAS, his interests include Zydeco music, eating crawfish, horses, and
football; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus is a dedicated servant having devoted his life to
serving God's people, is an inspiration to the numerous parishioners he has served, and
merits a special measure of commendation; and
Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 78	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, upon the celebration of Reverend Andrus' fortieth anniversary of
ordination, it is appropriate to recognize his honorable leadership in the Catholic church. 
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
does hereby commend Reverend Charles Andrus, S.S.J. on the celebration of his fortieth
anniversary of ordination to the priesthood, does hereby recognize his noble achievements
and contributions in his priestly ministry, and does hereby wish him full measures of success
and happiness in the future.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
Reverend Charles Andrus.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
Page 3 of 3