Senate | 05/30/2016 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |