House
|
03/03/2017
|
Effective date: March 3, 2017.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/19/17.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|