House
|
02/24/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2017
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 81, nays 14. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/19/17.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Reported favorably (21-2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|