House | 02/21/2017 | Notice removed | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/21/17. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 02/19/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/20/17. | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/19/17. | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Reported with amendments (22-0). | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |