House | 02/24/2017 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/22/17. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/21/17. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |