House
|
06/23/2017
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/14/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2017
|
Reported favorably (21-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|