House
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective date: 08/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 132.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|