Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported with amendments (9-3-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|