House
|
06/26/2017
|
Effective date: 01/01/18.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 412.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 62, nays 23, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|