Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|