House | 05/30/2017 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported without amendments (6-0-1). | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Prefiled. |