House | 05/24/2017 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 27, nays 66. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Prefiled. |