House | 05/30/2017 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably (8-4). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Prefiled. |