Senate | 05/30/2017 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported with amendments (12-0-1). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Prefiled. |