House
|
06/14/2017
|
Effective date: 08/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 205.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|