Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17. | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2017. | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Prefiled. |