Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 12 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported with amendments (16-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|