House
|
06/26/2017
|
Effective date: 06/26/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 389.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, Mills, and Perry.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Barras, Bishop, and Huval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|