House
|
06/26/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 34. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|