House
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective date: 08/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 79.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 17 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably (14-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|