Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|