House | 05/30/2017 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably (16-0). | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |