Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 21. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported with amendments (8-7).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|