House
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective date: 07/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 120.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|