Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|